FL S0712 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of "prepaid calling arrangement" to clarify and update which services are included under that definition and subject to a sales tax, etc.
Title
Taxes on Prepaid Calling Arrangements
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Galvano [R] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] | Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] |
Sen. Darren Soto [D] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38) |
2014-05-02 | House | In Messages |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/14 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/24/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/02/14, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/04/14, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0847 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
H5601 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2014-132), HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40)
H5601 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2014-132), HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
202 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |