FL S0710 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from ad valorem taxation for blood establishments, etc.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0515 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee