FL S0706 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Chapter No. 2015-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Chapter No. 2015-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions and repealing provisions to conform to the directive of the Legislature in section 9 of chapter 2012-116, Laws of Florida, codified as section 11.242(5)(j), Florida Statutes, to prepare a reviser's bill to omit all statutes and laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Chapter No. 2015-4 | |
2015-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-10 | House | Substituted for HB 7033 |
2015-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/15 |
2015-03-05 | House | Received |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (219210, 912826) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7033 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 706 (Ch. 2015-4)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
257 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
257 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
257 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4789 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 497 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 427 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 763 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 873 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 874 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 876 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 942 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 526 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 527 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |