FL S0702 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a court to suspend an order requiring a parent to pay child support under certain circumstances; requiring a court to suspend an order requiring a parent to pay child support and to deny an order of contempt under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Child Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0341 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |