FL S0702 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for information concerning minor preregistered voter registration applicants; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Preregistered Voter Registration Applicants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/22/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/16/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/02/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/26/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/20/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0647 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee