FL S0702 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (219963) -SJ 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (219963) -SJ 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to post on its website certain resources and a website link to specified materials regarding umbilical cord blood banking. Requires the department to encourage certain health care providers to make available to their pregnant patients information related to umbilical cord blood banking. Provides that a health care provider or health care facility and its employees or agents are not liable for damages in a civil action, etc.
Title
Umbilical Cord Blood Banking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (219963) -SJ 1003 | |
2011-05-04 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1123 | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1064 | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1012 | |
2011-04-06 | In Messages | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 364 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 04/06/11 | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 235 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-10 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 185 | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 185 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 57 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 57 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0471 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 702 (Ch.