FL S0692 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception to the prohibition on a high-performing charter school establishing more than one charter school in this state under specified circumstances; authorizing certain out-of-state entities to apply for designation as a high-performing charter school system; requiring that charter schools established by such entities receive a reduction in certain administrative fees, etc.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/11/15, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7037 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1552 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1145 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1552 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1145 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/692 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0692/BillText/Filed/HTML |