FL S0690 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the requirement that the Florida Solar Energy Center set standards for and approve solar energy systems; requiring that a solar energy system manufactured, sold, or installed in the state meet the safety and performance standards established by Underwriters Laboratories, Inc., etc.
Title
Solar Energy Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 170 | |
2012-01-17 | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 170 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 58 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 58 | |
2011-10-26 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/690 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0690/BillText/Filed/HTML |