FL S0688 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Family and Medical Leave Act"; requiring an employer to allow certain employees to take family and medical leave to bond with a minor child upon the child's birth, adoption, or foster care placement; prohibiting an employer from taking adverse action against an employee who requests or obtains family and medical leave; requiring that family and medical leave be taken concurrently with any leave taken under federal family and medical leave law; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to create a model notice that specifies an employee's rights related to family and medical leave and family and medical leave insurance benefits, etc.
Title
Employment Practices for Family and Medical Leave
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S656 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H627 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H629 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H627 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H629 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
444 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/688 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/688/BillText/Filed/HTML |