FL S0686 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the water management districts, with Department of Environmental Protection oversight, to adopt rules for specified design and performance standards relating to new development and redevelopment projects; providing a rebuttable presumption that certain stormwater management systems do not cause or contribute to violations of applicable state water quality standards; requiring certain inspection training for department, water management district, and local pollution control program staff, etc.
Title
Stormwater Management Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H405 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
H1343 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
H1343 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 4131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/686 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/686/BillText/Filed/HTML |