FL S0682 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expressing solidarity with the people of Venezuela in their pursuit of a strong and stable democratic government under which they may enjoy the political freedoms and economic security that are the hallmarks of democracy, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Venezuela/Juan Guaidó

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateAdopted
2019-03-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-11SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/14/19
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-06SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/06/19, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Rules
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback