FL S0676 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-60, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7055 (Ch. 2015-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the application forms for motor vehicle registration and renewal of registration to include language permitting the applicant to make a voluntary contribution to End Breast Cancer to be distributed to a specified organization and used for specified purposes; requiring an application form for a driver license or identification card to include language permitting the applicant to make a voluntary contribution to End Breast Cancer to be distributed to a specified organization, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary Contributions to End Breast Cancer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-60, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7055 (Ch. 2015-163)
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 2
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 621
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-14SenateImmediately certified
2015-04-14SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-02SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-19SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/19/15, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2015-03-05SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/05/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-02-06SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0621 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 676 (Ch. 2015-60), CS/HB 7055 (Ch. 2015-163)
H7055 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-163, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 676 (Ch. 2015-60)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback