FL S0668 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "child care facility" to exclude government-sponsored recreation programs; providing that certain requirements imposed on child care facilities do not apply to summer day camps and summer 24-hour camps, with an exception; prohibiting persons convicted of certain sex offenses from residing within a specified distance of government-sponsored recreation programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreation Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-06SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2020-02-06SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H83 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4023132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback