FL S0668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising notice requirements for the filing of temporary injunctions relating to the enjoinment of certain nuisances; providing that the use of a location by a criminal gang, criminal gang members, or criminal gang associates for criminal gang-related activity is a public nuisance; declaring that any place or premises that has been used on more than two occasions within a certain period as the site of specified violations is a nuisance and may be abated or enjoined pursuant to specified provisions, etc.
Title
Public Nuisances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H551 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |