FL S0668 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 209 (Ch. 2015-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 209 (Ch. 2015-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision requiring the county governing authority to develop and execute interlocal agreements with local government entities providing emergency fire and rescue services; requiring a local government entity requesting and receiving certain personnel or equipment from another service provider to pay for such personnel or equipment from its share of surtax proceeds; deleting a provision requiring local government entities to enter into an interlocal agreement in order to receive surtax proceeds, etc.
Title
Emergency Fire Rescue Services and Facilities Surtax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 209 (Ch. 2015-169) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 209 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0209 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-169