FL S0668 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing direct receipt of merchandise under certain circumstances; specifying a cap on the redemption value of points or coupons; requiring the Department of Revenue to calculate annually an adjusted cap; requiring the department to publish the amount of the adjusted cap in a brochure accessible from its website, etc.
Title
Amusement Machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-11 | Senate | CS by Gaming read 1st time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Gaming; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Gaming, 03/10/14, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Gaming; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0945 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on Gaming
H1383 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H1383 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
849 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |