FL S0668 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising requirements for determining the amount of a reimbursement for repackaged or relabeled prescription medication; providing limitations, etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation Medical Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget | |
2012-02-29 | Now in Budget -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-27 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 685 | |
2012-02-24 | Now in Budget -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Regulation (115316); YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/22/12, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/16/12, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-20 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Banking and Insurance (666350); YEAS 7 NAYS 4 -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 57 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 57 | |
2011-10-25 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/668 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0668/BillText/Filed/HTML |