FL S0664 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that certain motor fuel taxes paid by a county sheriff's office be returned and used to offset ongoing fuel costs, etc.
Title
State Taxes on Motor Fuel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2013-03-19 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/07/13, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
206 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 874 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |