FL S0648 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that participants in certain disabled persons' work experience activities are considered state employees for workers' compensation purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Services for Persons with Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 1437
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted HB 1437
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1437 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-72

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413209Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback