FL S0644 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Postsecondary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Postsecondary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Matching Endowment Scholarship Program within the Department of Education; requiring a historically black college or university to provide a certain amount of funds by a specified date to participate in the program; requiring program funds to remain in the trust fund, etc.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities Matching Endowment Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Education Postsecondary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H683 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/644 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/644/BillText/Filed/HTML |