FL S0644 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Florida Hospital Patient Protection Act"; requiring that each health care facility implement a staffing plan that provides minimum direct care registered nurse staffing levels; requiring a direct care registered nurse to demonstrate competence and to receive specified orientation before being assigned to a hospital or clinical unit; prohibiting a health care facility from imposing mandatory overtime and from engaging in certain other actions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delivery of Nursing Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H231 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback