FL S0644 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a procedure by which a person may seek a court order to seal and destroy an arrest record if the person is determined to be factually innocent of any charge arising out of the arrest; requiring that a petition for relief be heard within a certain time; authorizing the court, under certain circumstances, to grant relief to a petitioner in a case in which an accusatory pleading has been filed; authorizing a person, under certain circumstances, to file for relief if there is no conviction; requiring that the Department of Law Enforcement furnish forms to be used by persons applying for the destruction of their arrest records or for the written declaration that they are factually innocent; authorizing the court to open a sealed record in a civil procedure under certain circumstances; limiting the persons who have access to the sealed arrest records, etc.
Title
Sealing and Destroying Certain Criminal Records
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 55 | |
2011-11-18 | Now in Criminal Justice | |
2011-11-18 | References corrected to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 55 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Budget | |
2011-10-24 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/644 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0644/BillText/Filed/HTML |