FL S0636 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing requirements to allow certain foreign-trained physicians to obtain a restricted license; requiring the Department of Health to renew a restricted license if certain conditions are met, etc.
Title
Licensure of Internationally Trained Physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/636 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/636/BillText/Filed/HTML |