FL S0634 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 342, 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 342, 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "launch support facilities"; deleting the term "spaceport launch facilities," etc.
Title
Spaceport Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#638 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 342, 508 | |
2012-01-25 | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 267 | |
2012-01-25 | Read 3rd time -HJ 267 | |
2012-01-24 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-01-24 | Substituted for HB 97 -HJ 254 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/12 | |
2012-01-19 | Received -HJ 230 | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 230 | |
2012-01-11 | In Messages | |
2012-01-10 | Immediately certified -SJ 11 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 54 | |
2012-01-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/12 | |
2011-12-05 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 111 | |
2011-12-05 | Favorable by- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-28 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 12/05/11, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security -SJ 54 | |
2011-10-20 | Filed |