FL S0632 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/19/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 10:30 am in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising eligibility requirements for the occupational therapist licensure examination; authorizing certain licensed occupational therapists to use a specified title and the associated initials; prohibiting certain persons from using a specified title and the associated initials; providing criminal penalties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational Therapy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/19/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-11SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-12-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2021-12-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-12-02SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-11-03SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2021-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H847 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100266Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback