FL S0632 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the disposal of personal property lost or abandoned on a university or Florida College System institution campus and the disposition of proceeds from the sale of such property. Repeals a provision relating to an exemption for students who earn 9 or more credits from one or more of the articulated acceleration mechanisms from any requirement of a public postsecondary educational institution which mandates enrollment during a summer term, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/06/11 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/05/11 | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/11 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-25 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 1 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-12 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-11 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-06 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/11/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-24 | Remaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 293 | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Higher Education read 1st time -SJ 275 | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-09 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 03/14/11, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 53 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Higher Education; Budget -SJ 53 | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4175 () 2011-02-17 - Filed
H4177 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1732 () 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 772
H4177 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1732 () 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 772
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |