FL S0630 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities and counties to further restrict smoking within the boundaries of certain public parks, etc.
Title
Regulation of Smoking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1 454 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H457 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S670 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S670 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology