FL S0630 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that an individual who practices as an athlete agent be licensed as a professional athlete agent or limited athlete agent by the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; providing that an agent contract may conform to the form approved by a national professional sports association for the sport in which the student athlete will be represented under certain circumstances; requiring that an athlete agent deposit a surety bond with the department before contacting an athlete or entering into an agent contract or contract for financial services with a student athlete under certain conditions; prohibiting an athlete agent from offering or furnishing anything of value to a student athlete or an individual related to the student athlete before the student completes his or her last intercollegiate sports contest, etc.
Title
Athlete Agents
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Norman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 54 | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 54 | |
2011-10-20 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 45615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4562 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/630 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0630/BillText/Filed/HTML |