FL S0620 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting certain employees from specified travel expense provisions when traveling under the Emergency Management Assistance Compact under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#204 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-55
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 7007
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-08HouseIn Messages
2015-04-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-04-02SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-19SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-03-17SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2015-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-12SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-10SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-05SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-03-04SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-02-06SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7007 (Similar To) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2015-55)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
252921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2529335Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback