FL S0612 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing landlords to require certain employees to undergo level 1 background screenings; requiring a written disclosure and signed acknowledgement of receipt in rental agreements and rental agreement renewals; authorizing tenants to terminate such agreements and renewals under certain circumstances; requiring deposit money to be refunded to tenants upon such termination; providing that tenants are responsible for any damage he or she caused to the premises, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Tenancies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H749 (Similar To) 2017-12-08 - Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
83495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83684Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback