FL S0610 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative intent and purpose. Defines terms. Requires the original seller of tickets to an event held at a publicly owned venue to keep all receipts from the ticket sales until the event occurs or to require a person or entity seeking an advance release of ticket sales to post a surety bond. Provides that a ticket purchaser is entitled to a refund for a cancelled event. Provides exceptions.
Title
Sale of Event Tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 51 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 51 | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1091 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/610 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0610/BillText/Filed/HTML |