FL S0608 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Identity Theft and Fraud Protection Act"; requiring an agency to review for information susceptible to use for purposes of identity theft or fraud before making postings to a publicly available website; requiring an agency to establish a policy providing for requests to remove an image or a copy of a public record containing information susceptible to use for purposes of identity theft and fraud, etc.
Title
Public Records/Identity Theft and Fraud Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/608 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/608/BillText/Filed/HTML |