FL S0608 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 731 (Ch. 2014-126)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 731 (Ch. 2014-126)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the POW-MIA Chair of Honor Memorial; authorizing the Florida chapters of Rolling Thunder, Inc., to fund the memorial; requiring the Department of Management Services to coordinate with the Division of Historical Resources regarding design and placement; prohibiting the construction and placement of a monument on the premises of the Capitol Complex unless authorized by general law and approved by the Department of Management Services; revising the powers and duties of the Florida Historical Commission to conform to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Monuments on the Capitol Complex
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Dorothy Hukill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 731 (Ch. 2014-126) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 731 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/05/14, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0731 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-126
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
265 | 0031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 0612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |