FL S0604 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Medicaid to reimburse for dental services provided in a mobile dental unit that is owned by, operated by, or contracted with a health access setting or another similar setting or program; requiring the chair of the Board of Dentistry to appoint a Council on Dental Therapy within a specified timeframe; authorizing a dental therapist under the general supervision of a dentist to administer local anesthesia and operate an X-ray machine, expose dental X-ray films, and interpret or read such films if specified requirements are met, etc.
Title
Dental Therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H961 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/604 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/604/BillText/Filed/HTML |