FL S0604 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of an individual who has applied for or received a license to carry a concealed weapon or firearm. Saves the exemption from repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act. Removes the scheduled repeal of the exemption.
Title
OGSR/Concealed Weapons or Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 594 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Now in Rules -SJ 461 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 461 | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/11, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-10 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 185 | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 185 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 51 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 51 | |
2011-01-26 | SPB 7008 submitted as a committee bill (SB 604) by Criminal Justice |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/604 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0604/BillText/Filed/HTML |