FL S0598 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the recertification and audit periods for eligible recipients of the Black Business Loan Program. Authorizes recipients to redress audit findings within a specified period. Provides term of funding agreements between recipients and the Office of Tourism, Trade, and Economic Development. Revises limits on the use of funds for technical support to black business enterprises and direct administrative costs.
Title
Black Business Loan Program
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Budget | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0317 () 2011-01-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 32
H0925 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1374 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0925 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1374 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/598 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0598/BillText/Filed/HTML |