FL S0588 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires district school board policies that specify emergency procedures to identity the agency that is responsible for notifying the school district of an occurrence that threatens the safety of students. Requires the agency to notify private schools in the school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 51
2011-02-09 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Budget -SJ 51
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0481 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback