FL S0586 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Sun Sea Smiles license plate, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates/Sun Sea Smiles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/21/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0947 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
H1375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/586 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0586/BillText/Filed/HTML |