FL S0576 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain Florida College System institutions to construct dormitories for up to 300 beds for students; prohibiting the use of state funds and tuition and fee revenues for construction, debt service payments, maintenance, or operation of such dormitories, etc.
Title
Public Educational Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#557 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Chapter No. 2016-32 | |
2016-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-17 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 341 |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/16 |
2016-02-12 | House | Received |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | In Messages |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (421746) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/21/16 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/14/16, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 12/03/15, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 11/17/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0341 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 576 (Ch. 2016-32)