FL S0576 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to restore funding for the Supportive Housing for the Elderly Program, etc.
Title
Supportive Housing for the Elderly Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Messages |
2014-04-11 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/11/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/18/14, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0925 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/576 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0576/BillText/Filed/HTML |