FL S0564 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2014-145)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2014-145)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying provisions relating to public deposits that are exempt from state security requirements; providing that a notice of the default or insolvency of a qualified public depository is not required if the Florida public deposits are acquired by a bank, savings bank, or savings association; providing that a bank, savings bank, or savings association that is not a qualified public depository and acquires Florida public deposits is subject to certain requirements; providing that a protection from loss is effective when a public depositor does not comply with certain provisions under specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Security for Public Deposits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2014-145) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted HB 7009 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/10/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/05/14, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/11/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7009 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-145
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
280 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |