FL S0538 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the State Watch Office within the Division of Emergency Management to create a list of reportable incidents; requiring a political subdivision to report incidents contained on the list to the office; authorizing the office to establish guidelines a political subdivision must follow to report an incident, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Community Affairs
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-10-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H865 (Same As) 2020-02-21 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/25/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
252351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback