FL S0538 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from willfully and maliciously sexually cyberharassing another person; authorizing a law enforcement officer to arrest, without a warrant, any person that he or she has probable cause to believe has committed sexual cyberharassment; providing an exception to the prohibition on search warrants being issued to search private dwellings, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Cyberharassment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#51 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#358 (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15 Chapter No. 2015-24
2015-05-14 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 2
2015-04-29SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (067405)
2015-04-24SenateIn returning messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 2
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (067405)
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-24HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 151
2015-04-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-23HouseReceived
2015-04-23HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-23HouseIn Messages
2015-04-23SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-14SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2015-04-13SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-10SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-09SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-31SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2015-03-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-30SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Rules
2015-01-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0151 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 538 (Ch. 2015-24)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
784048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784049Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921244Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93318Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/538
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/Amendment/595288/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/Amendment/194958/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/Amendment/067405/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/Vote/SenateVote_s0538c2015.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/Vote/HouseVote_s0538c2358.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0538/Vote/SenateVote_s0538c2051.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback