FL S0528 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 537 (Ch. 2023-146)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 537 (Ch. 2023-146)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Excluding certain offenders from eligibility to receive basic gain-time; excluding certain offenders from eligibility to receive incentive gain-time; excluding certain offenders from eligibility for specified reductions to a term of supervision; requiring a court to impose additional conditions of supervision on specified offenders, etc.
Title
Custody and Supervision of Specified Offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 537 (Ch. 2023-146) |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 537 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-29 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H537 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-146
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
794 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |