FL S0526 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a report to the Governor and Legislature by a certain date with certain recommendations. Requires the Department of Health to investigate the sources of contamination of beach waters. Requires the department to develop and implement a public education program regarding human actions that affect the water quality of beach waters.
Title
Beach Waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 46 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 46 | |
2011-01-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/526 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0526/BillText/Filed/HTML |