FL S0520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7059
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7059
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an applicant for licensure as an optometrist to submit proof to the Department of Health that she or he meets certain requirements; providing that an applicant must pass the licensure examination within a specified timeframe as a condition of licensure as an optometrist and certification to administer and prescribe ocular pharmaceutical agents, etc.
Title
Optometry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7059 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Substituted HB 7059 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/24/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-12-05 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7059 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-78
H1047 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1486 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H1047 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1486 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
463 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |