FL S0520 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that information obtained by an elder abuse fatality review team which is confidential or exempt from public records requirements retains its protected status; providing an exemption from public records requirements for identifying information of an elder abuse victim in records created by a review team; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing statements of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records And Public Meetings/Elder Abuse Fatality Review Teams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0518 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H0705 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
H0703 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
H0705 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
H0703 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/520 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0520/BillText/Filed/HTML |