FL S0516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the list of available sites at which early voting may be held to include specified facilities or any other location designated by a supervisor of elections as meeting the requirements of state law; deleting a requirement that an early voting site be designated and used as such for at least 1 year before an election; requiring that each county operate a certain total number of voting sites; revising the beginning and ending dates of early voting; revising the hours of early voting to 12 hours per weekday and 12 hours in the aggregate each weekend at each site during the applicable periods; deleting provisions that authorize the supervisor of elections to provide early voting for certain elections and to determine the hours of operation of early voting sites in those elections, etc.
Title
Early Voting
Sponsors
Sen. Nan Rich [D] | Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 46 | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; Rules -SJ 46 | |
2011-10-12 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/516 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0516/BillText/Filed/HTML |