FL S0512 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2015-110)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2015-110)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising and providing definitions; specifying the notification and consent procedures for performing an HIV test in a health care setting and a nonhealth care setting, etc.
Title
HIV Testing
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Geraldine Thompson [D] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2015-110) |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 321 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0321 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-110
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |