FL S0510 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "adverse incident"; requiring licensed physicians, certified nurse midwives, and licensed midwives to report an adverse incident and a medical summary of events to the Department of Health within a specified timeframe; requiring the department to review adverse incident reports and determine if conduct occurred that is subject to disciplinary action, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting of Adverse Incidents in Planned Out-of-hospital Births

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#862 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-21
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 1039
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 673
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-27HouseIn Messages
2018-02-21SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-01-23SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-18SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/18/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-09SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-11-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-07SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-10-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H673 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 510

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560495Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback